MD SB283 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from possessing, with the intent to unlawfully use, an implement of dogfighting; establishing penalties on conviction of a violation of the Act of a maximum imprisonment of 90 days or a maximum fine of $5,000 or both; providing that each implement of dogfighting possessed in violation of the Act is a separate offense; and authorizing a court to order a specified defendant to participate in and pay for psychological counseling as a condition of sentencing.
Title
Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Implement of Dogfighting
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Lisa Gladden [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] |
Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] | Sen. Justin Ready [R] |
Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2016-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-11 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {928076/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Abuse
Animals
Counselors
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drugs
Equipment
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Witnesses
Animals
Counselors
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Drugs
Equipment
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Witnesses