MD SB283 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Secretary of State Police to accept a background investigation performed on behalf of an armored car company in place of a criminal history records check performed by the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services under specified circumstances.
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Investigation - Armored Car Company Employees
Sponsors
Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] | Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] | Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Christopher Shank [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-05 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {568478/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Criminal Background Investigations
Guns
Licenses
Public Safety
Safety
State Police, Department of
Weapons
Work, Labor and Employment
Guns
Licenses
Public Safety
Safety
State Police, Department of
Weapons
Work, Labor and Employment