MD SB283 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a person who receives a traffic citation with a notice to appear in person for a violation that contributed to an accident that resulted in the death of another to comply with the notice to appear in court contained in a writ or trial notice issued by the District Court or a circuit court by appearing in person.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death - Appearance in Court for Traffic
Sponsors
Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] |
Sen. Norman Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2012-03-14 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-01-27 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-26 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |