MD SB282 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-06 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-06 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "Tier 1 renewable source" to exclude waste-to-energy; extending the eligibility of certain Tier 2 renewable sources for purposes of the renewable energy portfolio standard in certain years; altering the compliance fee for a shortfall from the required percentage of energy from Tier 2 renewable sources for the renewable energy portfolio standard in certain years; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Renewable Energy – Tiers 1 and 2 Sources – Modifications and Compliance Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-6) (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {673422/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted (33-13) (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {673422/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted (33-13) (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-6) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {833929/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment {673422/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted (33-13) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {297476/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {297476/1 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Finance |