MD SB282 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or a municipal corporation to grant a specified property tax credit for specified residential real property owned by specified surviving spouses or specified cohabitants of specified fallen law enforcement officers and rescue workers; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2017; etc.
Title
Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Alterations
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Ready [R] | Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] | Sen. George Edwards [R] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Johnny Salling [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {609731/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Counties
Disabilities
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Rescue Squads
Spouses
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Disabilities
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Rescue Squads
Spouses
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local