MD SB282 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the Office of Cemetery Oversight in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law) by extending to July 1, 2023, the termination provisions relating to statutory and regulatory authority of the Office; exempting private family cemeteries that do not conduct public sales from specified permitting and registration, perpetual care, and preneed contract requirements of the Maryland Cemetery Act; adding a representative from a crematory to the Advisory Council on Cemetery Operations; etc.
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments 516685/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-31 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-03-31 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2012-02-16 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-14 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable with Amendments 717275/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-13 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-01-26 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-26 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Cemeteries
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Cremation
Disclosure
Investments
Licenses
Publications
Records
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Cemeteries
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Cremation
Disclosure
Investments
Licenses
Publications
Records
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset