MD SB281 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Maryland Cybersecurity Council to include the State Administrator of Elections or the State Administrator's designee.
Title
Maryland Cybersecurity Council - Membership - Revisions
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] | Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] | Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Sen. Douglas Peters [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-0) (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-0) (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-26 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-0) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {144339/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Cybersecurity
Elections
General Assembly
Public Officials
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Cybersecurity
Elections
General Assembly
Public Officials
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials