MD SB281 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to prescribe different qualifications for judges of the Orphans' Court for Prince George's County; requiring judges of the Orphans' Court for Prince George's County to have been admitted to practice law in the State and be members in good standing of the Maryland Bar; and submitting this amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Title
Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - Qualifications
Sponsors
Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Thomas Miller [D] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] |
Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (105-29) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2011-04-06 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2011-03-08 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-04 | Floor Amendment (Senator Stone) Adopted | |
2011-03-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-02 | Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Stone) Adopted | |
2011-03-02 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-01 | Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Stone) Adopted | |
2011-03-01 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-31 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Attorneys
Baltimore County
Constitutional Amendments
Judges
Orphans' Court
Prince George's County
Referendum
Baltimore County
Constitutional Amendments
Judges
Orphans' Court
Prince George's County
Referendum