MD SB280 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to specified public officials on or before October 1, 2013; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-01-27 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-26 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0280.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0280f.pdf |