MD SB28 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person who is at least 13 years old, a corporation, a partnership, an association, a nonprofit entity, the State, or any unit or political subdivision of the State from knowingly and intentionally releasing or causing to be released, or organizing the release of, a balloon into the atmosphere, with certain exceptions; requiring a certain unit, officer, or official of a local government with delegated enforcement authority to report certain violations; establishing a civil penalty of $250 for a violation of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Floor Amendment 653325/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2020-02-11SenateThird Reading Passed (38-8)
2020-02-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-07SenateFloor Amendment {653325/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted (36-10)
2020-02-07SenateFloor Amendment {223226/1 (Senator Jennings) Withdrawn
2020-02-06SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2020-02-06SenateFloor Amendment {223226/1 (Senator Jennings)
2020-02-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Adopted
2020-02-05SenateMotion Special Order until 2/6 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2020-02-05SenateFavorable
2020-02-04SenateMotion Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Hough) Adopted
2020-02-04SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2020-02-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {984332/1
2020-02-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-01-08SenateHearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-08SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-07-14SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB13 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment92301(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback