MD SB28 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that, beginning on October 1, 2016, the reasonable steps specified departments, agencies, and programs are required to take under specified provisions of law include the operation and maintenance of equal access versions of specified Web sites in a language spoken by any limited English proficient population of at least .5% of the overall population within the State and that can be translated free-of-charge; requiring the Department of Information Technology to establish specified minimum standards; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government - Web Sites - Language Access

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-4) (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House of Delegates - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-33) (Y: 102 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-7) (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 151
2016-04-11SenatePassed Enrolled
2016-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed (42-4)
2016-04-11SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2016-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (102-33)
2016-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {146885/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2016-03-23HouseHearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-15HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2016-02-12SenateThird Reading Passed (39-7)
2016-02-10SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-02-10SenateFavorable with Amendments {854430/1 Report Adopted
2016-02-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-01-21SenateHearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2015-09-30SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0028&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0028f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0028t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb0028e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_151_sb0028e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0028_85443001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0028_14688501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb0028.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0028_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb0028_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0028,s-0214&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0028,h-1056&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0028,s-1213&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback