MD SB279 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting actions constituting false claims against a State health plan or a State health program; providing penalties for making false claims against a State health plan or a State health program; requiring the court to consider and give special attention to specified factors in determining the fines and penalties provided for in the Act; authorizing the State or a person on behalf of the State to file a civil action against a person who makes a false claim against a State health plan or a State health program; etc.
Title
Maryland False Health Claims Act of 2010
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {763228/1 Rejected (Y: 20 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-19 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {763228/1 Rejected (Y: 20 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (105-33) | |
2010-04-02 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Reznik) Rejected (59-78) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Shank) Rejected (35-97) | |
2010-04-01 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Tarrant) Rejected (61-73) | |
2010-04-01 | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Cane) Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Tarrant) | |
2010-04-01 | Special Order next session (Delegate Schuler) Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Floor Amendment (Delegate Tarrant) | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2010-03-23 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) | |
2010-03-21 | First Reading Judiciary & Appropriations | |
2010-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (37-8) | |
2010-03-19 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-19 | Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) Rejected (20-26) | |
2010-03-18 | Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted | |
2010-03-18 | Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) | |
2010-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Special Order 3/18 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-02 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) | |
2010-02-02 | Hearing cancelled (Judicial Proceedings) | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings & Finance |
Subjects
Attorney General
Attorneys` Fees
Civil Actions
Comptroller
Court Costs
Courts
Damages
Disclosure
Discrimination
Fraud
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Statutes of Limitation
Work, Labor and Employment
Attorneys` Fees
Civil Actions
Comptroller
Court Costs
Courts
Damages
Disclosure
Discrimination
Fraud
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Statutes of Limitation
Work, Labor and Employment