MD SB274 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a specified exception to a provision providing that an order or a decision in a domestic violence proceeding is inadmissible as evidence in a divorce proceeding; and establishing a specified exception to a provision prohibiting a court from considering compliance with a domestic violence order as grounds for granting a decree of limited or absolute divorce.
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence Order
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {732012/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {238776/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |