MD SB273 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from intentionally operating an unmanned aircraft over a correctional facility to record images of the facility without the authorization of the managing official of the correctional facility or the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services; prohibiting a person from using an unmanned aircraft to deliver contraband to a person detained or confined in a place of confinement; and requiring a correctional facility to post signage warning of the prohibitions in a visible area on the exterior of the property.
Title
State and Local Correctional Facilities - Operation of Unmanned Aircraft - Image Recording and Delivery of Contraband
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2024-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-03-28 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {933223/1 Adopted |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Corrections
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Digital Images
Drones
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Signs and Billboards
Transfer of Goods
Corrections
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Digital Images
Drones
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Signs and Billboards
Transfer of Goods
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 9 | 417.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 8 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |