MD SB273 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 692
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 692
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a county from receiving specified revenues derived from a State forest or State park reserve and concession operations within a county if the county receives specified State payments in a fiscal year; requiring specified payments to counties for State forests, State parks, and wildlife management areas that are exempt from the property tax; providing for the calculation of the payment; clarifying when land is to be included in the specified calculation; etc.
Title
State Forest, State Park, and Wildlife Management Area Revenue Equity Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-4) (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 692 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-4) |
2017-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {490014/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {969932/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Animals
Appropriations
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Consumer Price Index
Counties
Forests and Parks
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Program Open Space
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Taxes - Property
Appropriations
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Boundaries
Commerce and Business
Consumer Price Index
Counties
Forests and Parks
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Program Open Space
Revenue and Taxes
State Aid
Taxes - Property