MD SB272 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, subject to certain limitations, the disclosure of tax information to certain persons or governmental entities authorized by the Comptroller in writing to receive the tax information for the purpose of identifying, preventing, or responding to fraud.
Title
Disclosure of Tax Information - Fraud Identification, Prevention, or Response
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 13 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |