MD SB271 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, except under certain circumstances, certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide certain benefits under certain insurance policies or contracts to provide coverage for certain fertility preservation procedures; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - Coverage of Fertility Preservation Procedures for Iatrogenic Infertility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 716
2018-03-29SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-29SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-03-28HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2)
2018-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {656786/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-22HouseHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-19HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-02-16SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-02-14SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {737070/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-02-07SenateHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0271&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0271f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0271t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0271e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_716_sb0271e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0271_73707001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0271_65678601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0001/sb0271.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0271_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0259.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0271_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0891.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0921.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback