MD SB271 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 665
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 665
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Beginning in fiscal year 2017, increasing the amount of money from $20,000,000 to $40,000,000 the Governor is required to provide in the State budget for the Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms each fiscal year; and altering a specified reporting date.
Title
Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-18) (Y: 119 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-14) (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-14) (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 665 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-18) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2016-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-01 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-14) |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {899331/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Capital Budget
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Education, Boards of
Grants
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Baltimore City
Capital Budget
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Education, Boards of
Grants
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports