MD SB271 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Including as an allowable expenditure of funds from a campaign account under the State election law a disbursement to pay for travel, lodging, meals, and registration expenses associated with attendance of an office holder or a candidate at meetings or conferences focused on legislative issues, process, or public policy analysis pertinent to the office the elected official holds or that the candidate seeks.
Title
Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference Expenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Committee Amendment (#2) Adopted (30-14) (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Senate | Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway) |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Special Order until 4/13 (Senator Conway) Adopted |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {833620/1 Adopted |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#2) Adopted (30-14) |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {464331/1 |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {464331/1 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {464331/1 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |