MD SB270 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to appoint each member of the Allegany County Board of License Commissioners with the advice and consent of the central committee of a specified political party; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County Board of License Commissioners -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-17 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-16 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-11 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-31 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Allegany County
Governor
License Commissioners, Boards of
Political Committees
Allegany County
Governor
License Commissioners, Boards of
Political Committees