MD SB27 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council to be the Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Dementias Council; establishing 3-year terms for the appointed members of the Council; requiring the Council, by September 1, 2022, and by September 1 every 5 years thereafter, to issue and publish an update to the State Plan on Alzheimer's Disease and Related Dementias; establishing the position of Director of Dementia Services and Brain Health to facilitate communication relating to dementia services; etc.
Title
Alzheimer's Disease and Dementia - Council and Coordination of Services (Dementia Services Act of 2022)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2022-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {273726/1 Adopted |
2022-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {933021/1 Adopted |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB166 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Data
Diseases
Education
Governor
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Medical Conditions
Medical Research
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Public Officials
Publications
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Work, Labor, and Employment
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Data
Diseases
Education
Governor
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Medical Conditions
Medical Research
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Public Officials
Publications
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2013 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2016 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2019 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Health - General | 13 | 3201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 3207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-32A | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-32A | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-32A | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-32A | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-32A | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13-32A | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |