MD SB269 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting certain persons subject to campaign finance regulation from making or accepting monetary contributions or monetary donations using any currency other than United States currency; prohibiting a campaign finance entity or a person acting on behalf of a campaign finance entity from making a monetary expenditure using any currency other than United States currency; authorizing the State Administrator of Elections or the Administrator's designee to investigate potential violations of the Act; etc.
Title
Currency - Campaign Finance Prohibitions - Disclosures by Financial Institutions
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Karen Lewis Young [D] | Sen. Benjamin Brooks [D] |
Sen. William Folden [R] | Sen. Mary James [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment 383029/1 (Delegate M. Morgan) Rejected (Y: 36 N: 100 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - Floor Amendment 383029/1 (Delegate M. Morgan) Rejected (Y: 36 N: 100 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-04-03 | House | Floor Amendment {383029/1 (Delegate M. Morgan) Rejected (36-100) |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2023-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {723528/1 Adopted |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 4:00 p.m. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB192 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Subjects
Campaign Financing
Circuit Courts
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Disclosure
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Commerce
Financial Institutions
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Circuit Courts
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Disclosure
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Commerce
Financial Institutions
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 234 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 238 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 250 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 604.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 604.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 13 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |