MD SB269 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the relief that may be awarded in a final protective order to include any other relief that a judge determines is necessary to protect a person eligible for relief from abuse.
Title
Domestic Violence - Additional Relief
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2015-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-04-08 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2015-03-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {678372/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |