MD SB269 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a voter in a municipal election is subject to the offenses and penalties related to voting specified in ยง 16-201 of the Election Law Article; and authorizing the State Prosecutor or the State's Attorney for a specified county to prosecute a person for an offense.
Title
Local Government - Municipal Elections - Voting Offenses, Penalties, and Enforcement
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {978570/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Elections
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
State Prosecutor
State's Attorneys
Voting
Crimes and Punishments
Elections
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
State Prosecutor
State's Attorneys
Voting