MD SB268 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-02 - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Kelley)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-02 - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Kelley)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the driver of a vehicle to drive on the left side of the roadway in a no-passing zone to overtake and pass a bicycle, farm equipment, a farm tractor, or an animal-drawn vehicle in accordance with a certain provision of law.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, Farm Equipment, Farm Tractors, and Animal-Drawn Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (25-21) (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Kelley) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Floor Amendment {723724/1 (Senator Jennings) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Floor Amendment {723724/1 (Senator Jennings) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (25-21) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {458973/1 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {458973/1 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Special Order until 2/28 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {458973/1 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Animals
Bicycles
Equipment
Farmland
Motor Vehicles
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Bicycles
Equipment
Farmland
Motor Vehicles
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road