MD SB268 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to prepare a specified fishery management plan for the cownose ray species; requiring the Department to prepare a specified fishery management plan for the cownose ray species on or before December 31, 2018, subject to available funding; prohibiting a person from sponsoring, conducting, or participating in a specified cownose ray fishing contest in State waters until July 1, 2019.
Title
Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-23) (Y: 115 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-23) (Y: 115 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (115-23) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {990715/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-14 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment {103824/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Special Order until 2/8 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Favorable |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Miller) Adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Favorable |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Contests
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations