MD SB268 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abolishing the Division of Pretrial Detention and Services within the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services; providing for the transfer of property, assets, licenses, credits, and rights of the Baltimore City Detention Center to the Mayor of Baltimore City; requiring the State to pay all the operating and capital costs of the Baltimore City Detention Center in fiscal years 2016 through 2018, one-half the costs in 2019, and providing that Baltimore City pay all the operating and capital costs in fiscal year 2020; etc.
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Senate | Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {308571/1 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Pugh) Adopted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {308571/1 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Baltimore City
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Capital Budget
Capital Budgets
Construction
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
Education
Health
Health Insurance
Home Detention
Job Training
Juvenile Causes
Leave
Liability
Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Operating Budget
Personal Property
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners
Procurement
Public Employees
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Works, Board of
Real Property
Records
Restitution
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
Support of Dependents
Torts
Work, Labor and Employment
Baltimore City
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Capital Budget
Capital Budgets
Construction
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Correctional Officers
Education
Health
Health Insurance
Home Detention
Job Training
Juvenile Causes
Leave
Liability
Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Operating Budget
Personal Property
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners
Procurement
Public Employees
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Works, Board of
Real Property
Records
Restitution
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
Support of Dependents
Torts
Work, Labor and Employment