MD SB268 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals to post each of its opinions on the Web site of the Maryland Judiciary and designate whether the opinion is reported or unreported; and providing that an unreported opinion of the Court of Appeals or the Court of Special Appeals may be cited only as provided in the Maryland Rules.
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Opinions - Public Information
Sponsors
Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] | Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Christopher Shank [R] |
Sen. Robert Zirkin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Electronic Government
Public Information
Court of Special Appeals
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Electronic Government
Public Information