MD SB267 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force on Prohibiting Debris From Entering Storm Drains or Stormwater Inlets; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation; requiring the Task Force, by November 1, 2019, to report its findings and to make recommendations to the General Assembly regarding the preventing plastic bottles and other debris from entering storm drains and stormwater inlets; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force on Prohibiting Debris From Entering Storm Drains or Stormwater Inlets

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback