MD SB266 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to use specified money from the Bay Restoration Fund to assist a person in paying the cost difference between a conventional on-site sewage disposal system and a system utilizing nitrogen removal technology in a specified order of priority; requiring the Bay Cabinet, in consultation with the Chesapeake Bay Commission and other interested parties, to review specified matters; requiring the Bay Cabinet to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly by December 31, 2017; etc.
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (27-18) (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Middleton) Rejected (20-26) (Y: 20 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Rejected (22-23) (Y: 22 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Middleton) Rejected (20-26) (Y: 20 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Rejected (22-23) (Y: 22 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (27-18) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {253122/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {703927/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Middleton) Withdrawn |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Motion (Senator Jennings) Reconsider Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Special Order until 3/7 (Senator Conway) Adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Motion (Senator Jennings) Reconsider Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Middleton) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment {253621/1 (Senator Reilly) Withdrawn |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment {253621/1 (Senator Reilly) |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Middleton) Rejected (20-26) |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Currie) Adopted |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Motion Reconsider the favorable report (Senator Currie) Adopted |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading Failed |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Rejected (22-23) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Conway) Adopted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Favorable |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Industry and Technology
Pollution
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers and Streams
Sewage
Coastal Bays
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Industry and Technology
Pollution
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rivers and Streams
Sewage