MD SB266 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Frederick County and the governing body of Washington County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on real property owned or leased by specified new or existing business entities that meet specified requirements; providing for the amount and duration of the property tax credits; etc.
Title
Frederick County and Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Job Creation by
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-03-26 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-24 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-22 | Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) 793620/2 Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:15 p.m. | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-25 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Frederick County
Leases and Rent
Notices
Property Tax
Small Business
Tax Credits
Washington County
Work, Labor and Employment
Leases and Rent
Notices
Property Tax
Small Business
Tax Credits
Washington County
Work, Labor and Employment