MD SB265 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination of a certain subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for income from the discharge of indebtedness related to costs incurred with respect to a principal residence; etc.
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Mortgage Forgiveness Debt Relief - Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-22 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |