MD SB265 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that specified members of the board of directors of the Washington Metrorail Safety Commission be appointed by the Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate; requiring one regular member of the board of directors of the Commission who is appointed by the Governor to be a resident of Montgomery County or Prince George's County; etc.
Title
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {390817/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment {143828/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Special Order until 2/16 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {513320/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Motion to Suspend Rule 46A (Senator Feldman) Adopted |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Special Order until 2/14 (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
District of Columbia
Emergency Bills
Interstate Affairs
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Public Officials
Residency
Safety
Sunset
Transportation - Generally
District of Columbia
Emergency Bills
Interstate Affairs
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Public Officials
Residency
Safety
Sunset
Transportation - Generally