MD SB265 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending through fiscal year 2019 a specified distribution of revenue from the State admissions and amusement tax on electronic bingo and electronic tip jars in Calvert County; altering the amount of a specified distribution; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2015-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Admissions and Amusement Tax
Bingo
Calvert County
Community Facilities and Services
Counties - Generally
Gaming
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Bingo
Calvert County
Community Facilities and Services
Counties - Generally
Gaming
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous