MD SB264 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from personal property taxes a community solar energy generating system that provides at least 50% of the energy it produces to low- or moderate-income customers at a cost that is at least 20% less than the amount charged by the electric company that serves the area where the system is located and is installed on a rooftop, parking facility canopy, or brownfield; prohibiting the supervisor of a county or a municipal corporation from accepting applications for the exemption after December 31, 2024; etc.
Title
Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Exemption From Property Taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Cory McCray [D] | Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] | Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] |
Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 2:45 p.m. |
2022-03-29 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {323123/1 Adopted |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {323123/1 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB76 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Subjects
Energy Matters
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Property Tax
Revenue and Taxes
Solar Energy
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Taxes - Property
Utilities
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Property Tax
Revenue and Taxes
Solar Energy
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Taxes - Property
Utilities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 7 | 237 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |