MD SB264 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 179
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 179
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, instead of a property tax credit, the governing body of Frederick County to provide, by law, a grant to certain elderly or disabled renters of property; etc.
Title
Frederick County – Elderly or Disabled Renters – Grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 179 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB353 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 178
Subjects
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Frederick County
Grants
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
Salaries and Compensation
Taxes - Property - Local
Elderly Persons
Frederick County
Grants
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
Salaries and Compensation
Taxes - Property - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |