MD SB262 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a county health department to issue a mobile reciprocity license to a specified mobile food service facility; authorizing a county health department to charge a fee not exceeding $300 for a mobile reciprocity license; providing that a mobile reciprocity license is valid for 1 year; prohibiting a county from requiring that a mobile food service facility be inspected before a county health department issues a mobile reciprocity license if the mobile food service facility has been inspected by the county of origin; etc.
Title
Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health Departments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-23 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {117272/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Counties
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Fees
Fines
Food
Health
Inspections
Licenses
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Public Health
Refuse Disposal
Registration
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Storage
Water
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Fees
Fines
Food
Health
Inspections
Licenses
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Public Health
Refuse Disposal
Registration
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Storage
Water