MD SB262 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Human Resources to take specified actions when serving as a representative payee or fiduciary for specified federal benefits for a child in the Department's custody; requiring the Department to provide specified notice to the child, through the child's attorney, of specified actions taken with respect to specified benefits for the child; etc.
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {238074/1 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Raskin) Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {238074/1 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Raskin) Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {238074/1 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {238074/1 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Raskin) Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {238074/1 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {238074/1 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Special Order until 4/01 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {238074/1 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {238074/1 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Appeals
Attorneys
Children
Estates and Trusts
Family Law
Federal Government
Fiduciaries
Foster Care
Hearings
Human Resources, Department of
Insurance
Minors
Notices
Records
Salaries and Compensation
Social Security
Veterans
Attorneys
Children
Estates and Trusts
Family Law
Federal Government
Fiduciaries
Foster Care
Hearings
Human Resources, Department of
Insurance
Minors
Notices
Records
Salaries and Compensation
Social Security
Veterans