MD SB259 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Korman, J. Lewis and Beitzel)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Korman, J. Lewis and Beitzel)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the calculation of the maximum amount of debt secured by future federal aid that the Department of Transportation may issue; providing that the maximum amount of debt that may be issued is calculated as of June 30 of any year; and providing that the proceeds from the issuance of certain debt may be used only for certain purposes.
Title
Department of Transportation - Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds - Calculation of Debt Limit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Floor Amendment 183723/1 (Delegate Clark) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 90 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Floor Amendment 183723/1 (Delegate Clark) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 90 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Korman, J. Lewis and Beitzel) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | House Refuses Recede |
2021-04-09 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Korman, J. Lewis and Beitzel) |
2021-04-09 | House | House Refuses Recede |
2021-04-09 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators McCray, Peters and Edwards) |
2021-04-09 | House | Senate Requests House Recede |
2021-04-09 | House | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators McCray, Peters and Edwards) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (121-9) |
2021-04-02 | House | Floor Amendment {183723/1 (Delegate Clark) Rejected (38-90) |
2021-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {404364/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {969632/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 3 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |