MD SB259 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Cecil County, for the purpose of providing Internet service, to exercise certain authority in the entirety of the unincorporated area of the county, establish a special taxing district if property owners in the proposed district petition the county in a certain manner, impose ad valorem or special taxes, and issue bonds in accordance with certain provisions of law.
Title
Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-8) (Y: 125 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-8) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {389739/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 2:30 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |