MD SB259 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Harford Community College Board of Trustees to borrow money for specified purposes and secure debt in a specified manner.
Title
Harford County - Harford Community College - Authority to Incur Debt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (129-7) | |
2012-03-28 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2012-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-24 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:15 p.m. | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-25 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |