MD SB258 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for specified qualifying police auxiliaries and reserve volunteers for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliaries or Reserve Volunteers
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {295162/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-04-08 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 2:20 p.m. |
2017-04-08 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2017-04-05 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |