MD SB258 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission on Climate Change in the Department of the Environment to advise the Governor and General Assembly on ways to mitigate the causes of, prepare for, and adapt to the consequences of climate change; establishing the membership of the Commission; requiring the Commission to establish specified working groups; requiring the commission members and working group members to be appointed and the Commission to be convened on or before July 1, 2016; etc.
Title
Maryland Commission on Climate Change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-12) (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-42) (Y: 98 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Bates) {103125/1 Rejected (14-33) (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Edwards) {723427/1 Rejected (21-25) (Y: 21 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Jennings) {563828/1 Rejected (14-33) (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-42) (Y: 98 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Bates) {103125/1 Rejected (14-33) (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Edwards) {723427/1 Rejected (21-25) (Y: 21 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Jennings) {563828/1 Rejected (14-33) (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-12) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (98-42) |
2015-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {230812/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Bates) {103125/1 Rejected (14-33) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {563120/1 Adopted |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {723427/1 Rejected (21-25) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {563623/1 Adopted |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {563828/1 Rejected (14-33) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Bates) Adopted |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {744036/1 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {744036/1 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
General Services, Department of
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Insurance Administration
Maps and Charts
Natural Resources, Department of
Planning, Department of
Public Information
Public Service Commission
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Transportation, Department of
Utilities
Weather
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Flood Control
General Services, Department of
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Insurance Administration
Maps and Charts
Natural Resources, Department of
Planning, Department of
Public Information
Public Service Commission
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Transportation, Department of
Utilities
Weather