MD SB254 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the first $250,000 in proceeds from the sale of a perpetual conservation easement on real property in the State.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |