MD SB251 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Commission on LGBTQ Affairs to be the Commission on LGBTQIA+ Affairs; increasing the number of members of the Commission from 15 to 21; altering certain qualifications for members appointed to the Commission; staggering the terms of Commission members; and altering the duties of the Commission.
Title
State Government - Commission on LGBTQIA+ Affairs - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-12) |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-33) |
2023-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {973723/1 Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-11) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {863320/1 (Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee) Adopted |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {863320/1 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB141 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Demographics
Gender
Human Rights
Names
Reports
Sexual Orientation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Demographics
Gender
Human Rights
Names
Reports
Sexual Orientation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 5 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9.5 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9.5 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9.5 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |