MD SB25 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB326
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from conducting visual surveillance with prurient intent of an individual located in a residence or place of private use or accommodation without the consent of the individual; altering the penalties for the crime of visual surveillance with prurient intent by use of a camera if the victim was a minor at the time of the offense and the offender is at least 4 years older than the victim; and providing penalties for a violation of the Act of imprisonment of up to 5 years or a fine of $2,500 or both.
Title
Criminal Law – Visual Surveillance With Prurient Intent – Private Place and Minor Victim
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB326 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Electronic Surveillance
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Privacy
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Electronic Surveillance
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Privacy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |