MD SB25 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology; altering the name of the Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology (CREST) and the name of the Governing Board; altering the powers and duties of the Board to require the Board to operate and exercise general control over Frederick CREST; requiring the Board to submit an adopted mission statement to the Maryland Higher Education Commission; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Title
Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-19 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {444237/1 Report Adopted |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Emergency Bills
Frederick County
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Names
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment
Emergency Bills
Frederick County
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Names
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment