MD SB25 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that when the interest in a vehicle of one joint owner passes to another joint owner who is the surviving spouse, the surviving spouse is not required to apply for a new certificate of title or submit a specified certificate of title to the Motor Vehicle Administration until a specified time; authorizing a surviving spouse to drive a vehicle and allow the vehicle to be driven on a highway until a specified time without applying for a registration; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title and Registration - Transfer to Surviving Spouse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2013-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {510510/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2012-10-19 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Death
Fees
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Titles
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Fees
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Titles
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration