MD SB246 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a secondhand precious metal object dealer, during the required holding period, to place specified items into a secure container under specified circumstances; and requiring a dealer to tag specified items in a specified manner when the dealer places specified items in the dealer's inventory.
Title
Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers - Securing and Tagging Items -
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (135-1) | |
2012-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-26 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-03-06 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-24 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-02-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-27 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |