MD SB242 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, under specified circumstances, to include primary care providers in the types of health care providers eligible to receive reimbursement for health care services that are delivered through telemedicine and provided to Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients; authorizing the Department to require a health care provider to submit a registration form that includes information required for the processing of claims for the reimbursement of specified health care services; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-04 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {377379/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Forms
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Assistance
Patients
Physicians
Public Health
Registration
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Committees and Commissions
Forms
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Assistance
Patients
Physicians
Public Health
Registration
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology